Financial history ST MARYS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1122601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £179.78k £198.10k £192.14k £189.76k £193.81k
Total expenditure £174.24k £190.23k £197.07k £182.33k £201.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A