Trustees ST MARYS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1122601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROL ANN TRUELOVE Cert Ed Chair 18 January 2016
THE HAYES (KENT) TRUST
Received: On time
Clare Scriven Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Mary Stannard Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Mary Whytock Trustee 29 July 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, HAYES, KENT
Received: On time
HAYES VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Mark Willoughby Trustee 17 May 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, HAYES, KENT
Received: On time