ST MARY'S FARNHAM ROYAL CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL - SCHOOL FUND ACCOUNT

Charity number: 1122654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £33.70k £12.72k £12.14k £14.03k £9.07k
Total expenditure £32.79k £6.27k £10.54k £10.60k £6.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A