Financial history BARBARA KWATENG LUPUS TRUST

Charity number: 1124613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021
Total gross income £6.50k £6.40k £4.10k £4.50k £2.40k
Total expenditure £6.36k £6.50k £4.00k £4.00k £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A