THE BACA CHARITY

Charity number: 1124569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £703.73k £766.51k £1.05m £1.14m £1.13m
Total expenditure £605.98k £700.26k £812.00k £916.77k £963.47k
Income from government contracts £550.07k £601.76k £784.78k £807.27k £746.70k
Income from government grants £73.06k £0 £8.73k £17.86k £26.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.48k £12.83k £30.07k £326.21k £33.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £689.03k £752.58k £1.01m £807.27k £1.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.22k £1.11k £1.58k £2.52k £2.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £430 £240 £70
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £485.48k £622.07k £719.31k £807.66k £848.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £78.22k £68.86k £67.20k £79.59k £87.59k
Expenditure - Governance £5.57k £1.44k £7.08k £0 £7.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £42.28k £9.33k £25.48k £29.52k £27.71k