THE BACA CHARITY

Charity number: 1124569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Vyner Trustee 22 March 2017
CHARNWOOD 20:20 Received: On time
SARAH SHORT Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
Andrew Brackett Trustee 01 October 2020
KING'S CHURCH LOUGHBOROUGH Received: On time
Louise Lloyd-Jarvis Trustee 12 March 2020 None on record
Tony Buttler Trustee 22 September 2016 None on record
Lucienne Elizabeth Connell Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Grahame Boocock Trustee 22 March 2017 None on record