DIANA MARY SYMON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £6.35k £6.90k £6.69k £7.13k £6.37k
Total expenditure £5.18k £15.95k £5.27k £25.57k £12.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A