COMMUNITY ACTION WIRRAL

Charity number: 1123267
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 06 September 2016 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 20 December 2016 324 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)