COMMUNITY ACTION WIRRAL

Charity number: 1123267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £663.46k £296.54k £295.98k £267.92k £460.50k
Total expenditure £658.10k £357.72k £338.66k £266.84k £452.65k
Income from government contracts £330.32k £102.00k £119.70k £136.82k £288.16k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £341.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £84.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £237.59k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £120 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £653.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A