SKRUM

Charity number: 1123597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 03 October 2017 On time Download