Financial history HIGHTIDE FESTIVAL PRODUCTIONS LTD

Charity number: 1124477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £678.06k £713.68k £672.93k £466.84k £476.16k
Total expenditure £712.04k £693.38k £681.24k £535.57k £300.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £30.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £208.31k £231.65k £191.65k £191.65k £273.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £485.18k £473.27k £477.83k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £39.25k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £192.88k £240.41k £155.85k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £26.00k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £712.04k £691.06k £679.32k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.23k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £2.32k £1.92k N/A N/A