EXODUS INTERNATIONAL MIRACLE CENTRE

Charity number: 1127863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £23.97k £30.72k £39.98k £47.00k £49.49k
Total expenditure £22.08k £30.98k £30.32k £45.65k £50.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A