CHARMS THE ESSEX THERAPY CENTRE

Charity number: 1123446
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 December 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 12 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 09 January 2019 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 05 December 2018 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 20 December 2017 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 14 December 2017 14 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 25 January 2017 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 02 November 2016 On time Download