THE QUILLING GUILD

Charity number: 1123927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Lee Hunziker Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record
Anne Lesley Whiteside Trustee 20 September 2014 None on record
Maria Kamel Boulos Trustee 18 September 2016 None on record
Jill Chapman Trustee 04 November 2013 None on record
JANE JENKINS Trustee None on record
Genevieve Godden Trustee 20 September 2015 None on record
RACHEL WINTER Trustee 02 November 2012 None on record
JANET ANNE HUNT Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. BARTHOLOMEW, OTFORD. Received: On time
JOSEPHINE MEGAN JENKINS Chair None on record
PHILIPPA REID Trustee 15 March 2012 None on record