Financial history KARAI WELFARE SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 1126413
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £19.77k £41.08k £24.73k £26.81k £24.52k
Total expenditure £16.61k £57.98k £27.51k £23.85k £19.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A