HARLESDEN UMMAH

Charity number: 1125188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 13 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 February 2017 On time Download