Accounts and annual returns Melanoma Focus

Charity number: 1124716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 17 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 04 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 04 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 11 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 15 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 15 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 14 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window