Financial history Melanoma Focus

Charity number: 1124716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £252.32k £142.57k £169.59k £220.42k £263.00k
Total expenditure £231.65k £233.24k £237.56k £285.43k £245.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A