CAREFREE - FOSTERING INDEPENDENCE CORNWALL

Charity number: 1124492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £450.16k £646.61k £733.59k £856.23k £1.02m
Total expenditure £424.73k £619.15k £730.31k £822.11k £786.13k
Income from government contracts £209.99k £377.81k £346.90k £377.33k £383.72k
Income from government grants £24.76k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £204 £2.55k £10.68k £35.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £646.39k £731.00k £845.47k £982.21k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £21 £37 £81 £49
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £619.15k £730.31k £822.11k £786.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0