CAREFREE - FOSTERING INDEPENDENCE CORNWALL

Charity number: 1124492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Belinda Hampton Chair 14 March 2019 None on record
Nicola Johnson Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
Mark Ellis Trustee 18 June 2019 None on record
Christine Walker-Booth Trustee 02 March 2017 None on record
Holly Seymour Trustee 03 March 2020 None on record
Melanie Carne Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
Luke Tilley Trustee 03 March 2020 None on record
Richard Grant Trustee None on record