THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINT DUNSTAN, CRANBROOK

Charity number: 1126417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.95k £10.48k £13.59k £14.28k £12.47k
Total expenditure £2.61k £10.96k £4.48k £18.25k £18.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A