THE ARM OF GOD INTERNATIONAL CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1124348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 24 April 2019 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 23 April 2019 481 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 10 April 2017 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required