DOVEDALE ARTS

Charity number: 1124004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required