TUNZA'S PRIDE

Charity number: 1126994
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £94.97k £102.77k £84.50k £82.32k £91.80k
Total expenditure £100.13k £107.94k £95.22k £72.46k £109.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A