THE FOOTLIGHTS TRUST CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1124022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £2.92k £6.59k £2.22k £408
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A