Financial history PEOPLES NEEDS UK

Charity number: 1126860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £211.30k £271.58k £227.14k £558.08k £560.93k
Total expenditure £191.04k £213.10k £255.59k £502.45k £502.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £558.08k £560.93k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £558.08k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £496.33k £498.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £6.13k £4.69k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £5.24k £15.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0