FAITH ENCOUNTER PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1124521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 October 2020 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 October 2020 459 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 January 2020 198 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 July 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required