FAITH ENCOUNTER PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1124521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.89k £17.42k £10.06k £9.34k £0
Total expenditure £8.42k £10.67k £12.88k £6.49k £545
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A