ADVENTURE UNDER SAIL

Charity number: 1124276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £496.98k £590.43k £444.69k £709.78k £842.75k
Total expenditure £594.29k £590.75k £579.26k £812.34k £898.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £474.72k N/A £331.09k £290.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £115.72k N/A £378.67k £552.09k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1 N/A £25 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £590.75k N/A £812.34k £898.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.52k N/A £101.71k £5.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0