Accounts and annual returns THE EVERYONE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139665
Charity reporting is overdue by 721 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 721 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 721 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 May 2021 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 August 2019 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required