LONDON CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST

Charity number: 1124513
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 July 2019 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download