SHIVIA

Charity number: 1126444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £249.87k £315.53k £313.63k £330.37k £459.92k
Total expenditure £513.43k £268.85k £285.01k £365.01k £305.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A