ROSA FUND

Charity number: 1124856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.42m £1.82m £2.03m £155.61k £4.48m
Total expenditure £848.28k £1.61m £2.30m £974.68k £2.12m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.20m N/A £781.76k N/A £1.91m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.42m £1.82m £2.02m N/A £4.47m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £7.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £79 £208 £3.19k N/A £806
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £819.50k £1.57m £2.26m N/A £2.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.79k £34.92k £39.28k N/A £40.29k
Expenditure - Governance £16.39k £20.62k £19.02k N/A £27.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £601.50k £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0