ROSA FUND

Charity number: 1124856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beverley Adella Huie Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record
Sarah Katherine Barber Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record
Gillian Green Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Kay Ali Trustee 22 March 2017 None on record
Sarah Catriona Pilkington Jackson Trustee 13 October 2020
COMMONWEAL HOUSING LIMITED Received: On time
DAVID AERON-THOMAS Trustee 22 March 2017 None on record
Lisa Elaine Raftery Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record
Catherine Jane Uttley Dovey Chair 16 January 2018 None on record
SHEILA JANE MALLEY Trustee 12 July 2016
CO-OPERATIVE COMMUNITY INVESTMENT FOUNDATION Received: On time