INTERCESSORS MINISTRIES OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1124574
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 May 2020 22 March 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 08 May 2019 25 March 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2019 25 March 2020 17 days late Download
Annual return 08 May 2018 29 March 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 08 May 2017 25 April 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2017 25 April 2018 48 days late Download
Annual return 08 May 2016 03 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2016 03 March 2017 On time Download