SURREY HEATH MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126441
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 April 2020 13 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2019 12 February 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2017 08 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2016 26 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2016 Not Required