Financial history POWER AND MERCY OUTREACH INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1125429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £47.81k £19.20k £13.15k £19.70k £59.98k
Total expenditure £24.05k £20.86k £28.24k £24.49k £6.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A