ETERNAL ZION CHURCH OF NIGERIA AND OVERSEAS (UK BRANCH)

Charity number: 1124739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 August 2019 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 July 2018 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 July 2018 518 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required