ETERNAL ZION CHURCH OF NIGERIA AND OVERSEAS (UK BRANCH)

Charity number: 1124739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.00k £800 £600 £800 £1.00k
Total expenditure £600 £500 £550 £600 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A