AFRICAN HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125276
Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 847 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 847 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 07 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required