CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE CANINE TRUST

Charity number: 1124683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £8.00k £5.60k £8.00k £8.01k £6.00k
Total expenditure £7.50k £5.40k £5.00k £5.17k £5.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A