PEMBROKESHIRE ACTION TO COMBAT HARDSHIP (PATCH)

Charity number: 1124949
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 October 2016 On time Download