PEMBROKESHIRE ACTION TO COMBAT HARDSHIP (PATCH)

Charity number: 1124949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £56.98k £72.41k £72.41k £80.41k £255.08k
Total expenditure £60.51k £61.36k £61.36k £72.51k £69.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.20k N/A £4.99k £59.52k