Accounts and annual returns THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION WEST SOMERSET BRANCH

Charity number: 1124882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 January 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required