Financial history SYLVA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £492.64k £766.42k £472.37k £496.96k £499.75k
Total expenditure £345.87k £397.95k £502.78k £437.22k £542.42k
Income from government contracts £21.88k £39.13k £75.49k £99.80k £135.20k
Income from government grants £12.88k £3.50k £60.50k £5.95k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £390.98k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £83.46k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £290.02k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £1.96k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £393.05k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.89k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.89k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A