SHELTER FROM THE STORM

Charity number: 1125575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 February 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 February 2020 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 November 2016 On time Download