Financial history CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON

Charity number: 1130217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.73k £22.11k £30.78k £30.12k £30.66k
Total expenditure £36.48k £24.36k £26.47k £27.36k £16.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A