Trustees CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON

Charity number: 1130217
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt. Rev. Roger Morris Chair 24 September 2014
ESSEX COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY YOUTH SERVICES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY FOR LICENSED MINISTERS IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD
Received: On time
Major Howard William Russell Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev Lynne Cullens Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Rev Claire Louise Blatchford Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Rev Lythan Elisabeth Nevard Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Rev George Watt Trustee 15 July 2021
UNITED REFORMED CHURCH THAMES NORTH SYNOD CHARITIES
Received: On time
Mark Barford Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
DAVID BAREHAM Trustee 24 June 2021
CHAFFORD HUNDRED COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
Rt Revd Dr Gulnar Eleanor Francis-Dehqani Trustee 11 March 2021
ST MELLITUS COLLEGE TRUST
Overdue by 18 days
THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
GUY HARLINGS ESTATE
Received: On time
THE OVERSEAS BISHOPRICS' FUND
Received: On time
Rev Jongikaya Zihle Trustee 24 October 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Y CARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
HACKNEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
REV David Chapman Trustee 01 September 2016
QUEENSWOOD SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Rt Rev Alan Williams sm Trustee 24 September 2014
Joseph Toomey Charitable Foundation
Received: On time