ASSOCIATION OF JAMAICAN NATIONALS (BIRMINGHAM) UK

Charity number: 1130750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.36k £32.01k £90.28k £36.46k £18.78k
Total expenditure £22.16k £36.13k £71.06k £33.25k £24.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A