ASSOCIATION OF JAMAICAN NATIONALS (BIRMINGHAM) UK

Charity number: 1130750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 July 2019 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2021 711 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 June 2018 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2019 365 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required